Simple Products v. Huang

Plaintiff: Simple Products
Defendant: Chia-Ling Huang
Case Number: 2:2019cv00317
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Chia-Ling Huang, Plaintiff Simple Products. Form due by 7/17/2019. (nl)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Chia-Ling Huang, Plaintiff Simple Products. (nl)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint,. Answer deadline updated for Chia-Ling Huang answer due 7/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/1/2019. (nl)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Chia-Ling Huang. Attorney Grant R Clayton added to party Chia-Ling Huang(pty:dft)(Clayton, Grant)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/10/2019. (las)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nl)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Chia-Ling Huang. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Chia-Ling Huang (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3271173) filed by Simple Products. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Hansen, Jed)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff Simple Products is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simple Products v. Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chia-Ling Huang
Represented By: Grant R Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simple Products
Represented By: Peter M. deJonge
Represented By: Mark M. Bettilyon
Represented By: Jed H. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?