Platte River Insurance v. Lake City Custom Homes et al
Plaintiff: Platte River Insurance
Defendant: Lake City Custom Homes and David J. Brown
Case Number: 2:2019cv00333
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #8 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Lake City Custom Homes, Inc., and David J. Brown and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance. (Faux, Kurt)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 After review of the case, case reassigned to a district judge per 9 Docket Text Order. Case randomly assigned to Judge Dee Benson. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (las)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE REASSIGNMENT. Based on the pending motion for entry of default #8 , it appears Defendants Lake City Custom Homes and David J. Brown have been served with process but failed to answer or otherwise timely respond to the complaint or consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be reassigned to a District Court Judge through the random reassignment process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 06/12/2019. (amn)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Lake City Custom Homes, Inc., and David J. Brown and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Kurt C. Faux in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default of Defendants Lake City Custom Homes, Inc., and David J. Brown, #2 Exhibit Proposed Defaults of Lake City Custom Homes, Inc., and David J. Brown)(Faux, Kurt)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for personal served on David J. Brown as Registered Agent for Lake City Custom Homes, Inc. on 5/16/2019, filed by Defendant Lake City Custom Homes., **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Platte River Insurance as to Lake City Custom Homes served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. (Faux, Kurt)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Platte River Insurance as to David J. Brown served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019., **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for personal served on David J. Brown on 5/16/2019, filed by Defendant David J. Brown. (Faux, Kurt)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/15/2019. (las)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to David J. Brown. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Lake City Custom Homes. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3274964) filed by Platte River Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- General Indemnity Agreement) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Faux, Kurt)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff Platte River Insurance is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Platte River Insurance v. Lake City Custom Homes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake City Custom Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Platte River Insurance
Represented By: Kurt C. Faux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?