USA v. Coleman et al

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Midland Funding, John Scott Coleman, Nationstar Mortgage, Anna Coleman, Brent A. Oliphant, Lisa F. Oliphant and Randall J. Coleman
Case Number: 2:2019cv00338
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Nationstar Mortgage. Attorney Robert H. Scott added to party Nationstar Mortgage(pty:dft)(Scott, Robert)
June 18, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Randall J. Coleman. Attorney Kyle D. Adams added to party Randall J. Coleman(pty:dft)(Adams, Kyle)
June 17, 2019 Filing 17 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA as to John Scott Coleman served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Lowe, Virginia)
June 17, 2019 Filing 16 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA as to Lisa F. Oliphant served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Lowe, Virginia)
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA as to Brent A. Oliphant served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Lowe, Virginia)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA as to Midland Funding served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Lowe, Virginia)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA as to Nationstar Mortgage served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Lowe, Virginia)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA as to Anna Coleman served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Lowe, Virginia)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA as to Randall J. Coleman served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Lowe, Virginia)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Brent A. Oliphant, Lisa F. Oliphant (alt)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to John Scott Coleman. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Lisa F. Oliphant. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Brent A. Oliphant. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Midland Funding. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Nationstar Mortgage. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Anna Coleman. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Randall J. Coleman. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants No Filing Fee filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (Lowe, Virginia)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Plaintiff USA is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) by the end of the business day. Filing Fee waived (USA)NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Coleman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Scott Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage
Represented By: Robert H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent A. Oliphant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa F. Oliphant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall J. Coleman
Represented By: Kyle D. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Virginia Cronan Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?