Nelson v. SymbolArts
Plaintiff: Eric Nelson
Defendant: SymbolArts
Case Number: 2:2019cv00340
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Referring Judge: Brooke C Wells
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #9 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (nl)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Eric Nelson, Defendant SymbolArts. Form due by 6/28/2019. (las)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Eric Nelson, Defendant SymbolArts. (las)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by SymbolArts. Attorney Kenneth E. Horton added to party SymbolArts(pty:dft)(Horton, Kenneth)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 REASSIGNMENT to Newly Appointed Magistrate Judge. Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells no longer assigned to the case. Case number will now read 2:19-cv-00340-CMR. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (jwt)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Nelson as to SymbolArts served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Strassberg, Evan)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an action mailed to the Register of Copyrights Office. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (tlh)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to SymbolArts. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against SymbolArts (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3276424) filed by Eric Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (Strassberg, Evan)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Plaintiff Eric Nelson is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. SymbolArts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Nelson
Represented By: Evan S. Strassberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SymbolArts
Represented By: Kenneth E. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?