US Securities and Exchange Commission v. Koskella

Petitioner: US Securities and Exchange Commission
Respondent: Kirk Irving Koskella
Case Number: 2:2019cv00352
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dale A Kimball
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Service by US Securities and Exchange Commission re #4 Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Whipple, David)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Hearing is set for 8/16/2019, at 10:00 AM in Rm 7.100 before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 6/10/2019. (eat)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 5/23/2019. (eat)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION to Enforce Administrative Subpoena. Fee waived filed by US Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order) Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (Whipple, David)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Petitioner US Securities and Exchange Commission is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) by the end of the business day. Filing Fee waived (USA)NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Securities and Exchange Commission v. Koskella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirk Irving Koskella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: US Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Amy J. Oliver
Represented By: David D. Whipple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?