Acosta v. Beantown Painting et al
Plaintiff: R. Alexander Acosta
Defendant: Nancy Norcross and Beantown Painting
Case Number: 2:2019cv00353
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory W. Tronson on behalf of R. Alexander Acosta (Tronson, Gregory)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Report and Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 01:15 PM in Rm 7.200 before Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. PLEASE NOTE: The standard procedure before Judge Jenkins is to hold status and scheduling conferences in open court and on the record. (kms)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Beantown Painting, Nancy Norcross. Attorney David E Ross, II added to party Beantown Painting(pty:dft), Attorney David E Ross, II added to party Nancy Norcross(pty:dft)(Ross, David)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants No Filing Fee filed by R. Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of employees, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet date stamped) Assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins (Tzagoloff, Lydia)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) by the end of the business day. Filing Fee waived (USA)NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. Beantown Painting et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Alexander Acosta
Represented By: Lydia Tzagoloff
Represented By: Gregory W. Tronson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Norcross
Represented By: David E Ross, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beantown Painting
Represented By: David E Ross, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?