Howell v. Department of the Treasury et al

Plaintiff: Patricia Howell
Defendant: Department of the Treasury and Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 2:2019cv00357
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Referring Judge: Brooke C Wells
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Executed served on US Attorney General on 6/14/2019 and IRS, Department of Treasury on 5/24/2019, filed by Plaintiff Patricia Howell. (las)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 REASSIGNMENT to Newly Appointed Magistrate Judge. Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells no longer assigned to the case. Case number will now read 2:19-cv00357-CMR. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (jwt)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Internal Revenue Service. (tlh)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Department of the Treasury. (tlh)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4681086376) (Fee Status: PAID) filed by Patricia Howell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G - Power of Attorney, #8 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howell v. Department of the Treasury et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?