Epilepsy Association of Utah et al v. Herbert et al

Plaintiff: Epilepsy Association of Utah, Andrew Talbott, Shalyce Kizerian, Truce, Christine Stenquist, Nathan Kizerian and Douglas Arthur Rice
Defendant: Joseph K. Miner and Gary R. Herbert
Case Number: 2:2019cv00360
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 22 Plaintiff's REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court Third District and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Epilepsy Association of Utah, Nathan Kizerian, Shalyce Kizerian, Douglas Arthur Rice, Christine Stenquist, Andrew Talbott, Truce. (Anderson, Ross)
July 8, 2019 Filing 21 Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court Third District and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Gary R. Herbert, Joseph K. Miner. (Dymek, Andrew)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants shall file a memorandum in opposition consisting of no more than 25 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/8/2019. (nl)
July 6, 2019 Filing 19 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #18 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Plaintiffs Epilepsy Association of Utah, Nathan Kizerian, Shalyce Kizerian, Douglas Arthur Rice, Christine Stenquist, Andrew Talbott, Truce. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Over-Length Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Case to State Court and for the Award of Attorney Fees)(Anderson, Ross)
July 5, 2019 Filing 18 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Defendants Gary R. Herbert, Joseph K. Miner. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Leave to file overlength memorandum in opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand case to state court and for the award of attorney fees)(Dymek, Andrew)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Stipulated Motion on Scheduling and Other Issues RE: Pending Motion to Dismiss #14 and Motion to Remand #15 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/5/2019. (nl)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 Stipulated MOTION for Amended Scheduling Order Re: Pending Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Remand filed by Defendants Gary R. Herbert, Joseph K. Miner. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Stipulated Motion on Scheduling and other issues Re: Pending Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Remand)(Dymek, Andrew) Modified on 7/5/2019 changed motion type to Motion for Extension of Time (nl).
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court Third District and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Epilepsy Association of Utah, Nathan Kizerian, Shalyce Kizerian, Douglas Arthur Rice, Christine Stenquist, Andrew Talbott, Truce. (Anderson, Ross)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Gary R. Herbert, Joseph K. Miner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Text of Proposition 2, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - H.B. 3001)(Dymek, Andrew)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 6/14/2019. (las)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 11/1/2019. Discovery due by 3/10/2020. Motions due by 4/17/2020. Status/Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2020 at 02:00 PM in Rm 7.100 before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 6/14/2019. (las)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Defendants Gary R. Herbert, Joseph K. Miner. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Stipulated Motion for Leave to file Overlength motion to dismiss)(Dymek, Andrew)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Anderson, Ross)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 File Received from Third District Court - Salt Lake, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket and State Court Documents (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Acceptance of Service, #5 Motion to Dismiss, #6 Amended Complaint, #7 Stipulation, #8 Order, #9 Notice of Removal) (las)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Plaintiffs Epilepsy Association of Utah, Nathan Kizerian, Shalyce Kizerian, Douglas Arthur Rice, Christine Stenquist, Andrew Talbott, Truce, Defendants Gary R. Herbert, Joseph K. Miner. (las)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs Epilepsy Association of Utah, Nathan Kizerian, Shalyce Kizerian, Douglas Arthur Rice, Christine Stenquist, Andrew Talbott, Truce. (las)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen(14) days after entry of this Order. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/28/2019. (las)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Gary R. Herbert, Joseph K. Miner. (las)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Epilepsy Association of Utah, Nathan Kizerian, Shalyce Kizerian, Douglas Arthur Rice, Christine Stenquist, Andrew Talbott, Truce, Defendants Gary R. Herbert, Joseph K. Miner. Form due by 6/7/2019. (nl)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Epilepsy Association of Utah, Nathan Kizerian, Shalyce Kizerian, Douglas Arthur Rice, Christine Stenquist, Andrew Talbott, Truce, Defendants Gary R. Herbert, Joseph K. Miner. (nl)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 180909139, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3282639) filed by Gary R. Herbert, Joseph K. Miner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Initial Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Acceptance of Service, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Stipulated Motion to Withdrawal, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - [Proposed] Stipulated Order, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Order Authorizing Additional Time, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I - Certificate of Service, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Dymek, Andrew)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Defendants Gary R. Herbert, Joseph K. Miner is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epilepsy Association of Utah et al v. Herbert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epilepsy Association of Utah
Represented By: Ross C. Anderson
Represented By: Walter M. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Talbott
Represented By: Ross C. Anderson
Represented By: Walter M. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shalyce Kizerian
Represented By: Ross C. Anderson
Represented By: Walter M. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Truce
Represented By: Ross C. Anderson
Represented By: Walter M. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Stenquist
Represented By: Ross C. Anderson
Represented By: Walter M. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Kizerian
Represented By: Ross C. Anderson
Represented By: Walter M. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Arthur Rice
Represented By: Ross C. Anderson
Represented By: Walter M. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph K. Miner
Represented By: Andrew Dymek
Represented By: David N. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary R. Herbert
Represented By: Andrew Dymek
Represented By: David N. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?