F. et al v. Tufts Health Plan

Plaintiff: R. F. and Daryl F.
Defendant: Tufts Health Plan
Case Number: 2:2019cv00368
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Referring Judge: Robert J Shelby
2 Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Tufts Health Plan answer due 8/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 7/22/2019. (jwt)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint filed by Defendant Tufts Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Response Date) Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero. Attorney Christopher M. Glauser added to party Tufts Health Plan(pty:dft)(Glauser, Christopher)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Daryl F., R. F. as to Tufts Health Plan Waiver sent on 7/9/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (King, Brian)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 6/27/2019. (mjm)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Daryl F., R. F. as to Tufts Health Plan Waiver sent on 5/28/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (King, Brian)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL Judge Ted Stewart recused. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 5/28/2019. (mas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Tufts Health Plan (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3283886) filed by Daryl F., R. F.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Ted Stewart (King, Brian)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Ted Stewart. Plaintiffs Daryl F. and R. F. are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: F. et al v. Tufts Health Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tufts Health Plan
Represented By: Christopher M. Glauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. F.
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nediha Hadzikadunic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl F.
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nediha Hadzikadunic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?