LHF Productions v. Helquist et al.
Plaintiff: LHF Productions
Defendant: Internet Subscribers 1-8, Rudy Bernal, Morgan Shimer, Lee Helquist, Tina Thao and Alisha Delgado
Case Number: 2:2019cv00371
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Rudy Bernal. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Alisha Delgado. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Morgan Shimer. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Tina Thao. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Lee Helquist. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Internet Subscribers 1-8 with Jury Demand. New Defendants: Lee Helquist, Tina Thao,Morgan Shimer, Alisha Delgado, Rudy Bernal. Removed Defendants: Internet Subscribers 1-8. filed by LHF Productions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit B - IP Information) (Zenger, Todd)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Unidentified Defendant, Internet Subscriber 8 (IP 75.169.212.169), without prejudice filed by Plaintiff LHF Productions (Zenger, Todd)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Limited Discovery. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 5/29/19 (alt)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 5/29/19 (alt)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 Report on the Filing of an action mailed to the Register of Copyrights Office. (tlh)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Daniel Arheidt in Support re #3 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Discovery and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff LHF Productions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Regional IP Data)(Zenger, Todd)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Discovery and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff LHF Productions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit B - Subscriber Data, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Zenger, Todd)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Internet Subscribers 1-8 (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3284846) filed by LHF Productions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit B - IP Information, #3 Civil Cover Sheet.) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Zenger, Todd)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiff LHF Productions is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LHF Productions v. Helquist et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internet Subscribers 1-8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudy Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Shimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Helquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Thao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alisha Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LHF Productions
Represented By: Todd E. Zenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?