Herrera v. Wilson et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Herrera
Defendant: Maryann Reding, Shane Nelson, Lucy Ramirez, Brad Wilson, Allen Kiesel and Mike Haddon
Not Yet Classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit and Correction Section (FYI)
Case Number: 2:2019cv00373
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Daniel Herrera filed by Daniel Herrera. (kpf)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Letter to the Court. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (kpf)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Letter to the Court re: Certificate of inmate account. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (kpf)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: It is therefore ordered: 1. Although the Court has already granted Plaintiffs application to proceed informa pauperis, Plaintiff must still eventually pay $350.00, the full amount of the filing fee. 2. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $1.09 within thirty days of the date of this Order, or the complaint will be dismissed. Plaintiff must make monthly payments of twenty percent of the preceding's month;s income credited to Plaintiffs account. 3. Plaintiff must make monthly payments of twenty percent of the precedings month's income credited to Plaintiff's account. 4. Plaintiff shall make the necessary arrangement to give a copy of this Order to the inmate funds accounting office at Plaintiff's correctional facility. 5. Plaintiff shall complete the consent to collection of fees and submit it to the inmate funds accounting office at Plaintiffs correctional facility and also submit a copy of the signed consent to this Court within THIRTY DAYS from the date of this Order, or the complaint will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 07/05/2019. (kpf)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File an amended complaint filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit-Amended Complaint)(kpf)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 **SEALED DOCUMENT**Inmate Statement and Certificate filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (kpf)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Lodged letter to the Court re: Inmate Account Officals. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (kpf)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Request for Certificate of Inmate Account to Central Utah Correctional Facility. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (kpf)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Mike Haddon, Allen Kiesel, Shane Nelson, Lucy Ramirez, Maryann Reding, Brad Wilson (Originally received by the court on 5/28/2019). (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Daniel Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge Dee Benson (nl)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. Collection of Fees Sent: No; denying #3 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/30/2019. (nl)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: all defendants (Originally received by the court on 5/28/2019) filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (nl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/19/2019: #1 Re-Scanned for OCR) (dtp).
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Daniel Herrera received from Correctional Institution. (nl)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. and Memorandum in Support Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 5/28/2019) filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrera v. Wilson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryann Reding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucy Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Kiesel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Haddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Correction Section (FYI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?