LRAD Corporation v. Argo-A Security
Plaintiff: LRAD Corporation
Defendant: Argo-A Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv00402
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Referring Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff LRAD Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Duke, Clinton)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Argo-A Security. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 6/17/19. (jmr)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (rks)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 6/14/2019. (ncw)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Argo-A Security. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Argo-A Security (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3299671) filed by LRAD Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (Duke, Clinton)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Plaintiff LRAD Corporation is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LRAD Corporation v. Argo-A Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LRAD Corporation
Represented By: Clinton E. Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argo-A Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?