Bahr v. Identisys Incorporated
Plaintiff: Jana Bahr
Defendant: Identisys Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv00405
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 17 JUDGMENT that case is dismissed with prejudice - CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 8/5/19 (alt)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING CASE per stipulation of parties. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 8/5/19 (alt)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF ERROR re #14 Stipulation of Dismissal. Description of error: document has wrong judge information on it. Filers are reminded to keep track of any/all judge reassignments and ensure that all case information on documents matches that appearing at the top of each CM/ECF screen before submitting same. (alt)
July 31, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Identisys Incorporated. (Kee, Conrad)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 Consent/Reassignment Forms have not been received. Case randomly assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement Pending by Identisys Incorporated (Kee, Conrad)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #6 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (nl)
June 19, 2019 ANSWER DEADLINE UPDATED for Identisys Incorporated answer due 7/5/2019 per #10 Clerk's Order. (jwt)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 CLERKS ORDER re #9 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer signed by Anne W. Morgan, Chief Deputy Clerk, Motions terminated: #9 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Identisys Incorporated. Answer due 7/5/2019. (jwt)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant Identisys Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kee, Conrad)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 File Received from Third District Court - Salt Lake, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket and State Court Documents. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 1) (las)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 Modification of Docket: Error: Order entered in incorrect case. Correction: Order will be entered in correct case. re #4 Order to Propose Schedule. (las)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Jana Bahr, Defendant Identisys Incorporated. Form due by 7/2/2019. (tlh)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Jana Bahr and Defendant Identisys Incorporated. (tlh)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Entry Error ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 6/14/2019. (las) Modified on 6/17/2019 by adding error text (las).
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 6/14/2019. (las)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 190904157, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3300412) filed by Identisys Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint and Unsigned Waiver of Service, #3 Exhibit Signed Waiver of Service, #4 Exhibit Business Filing Details, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Shields) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Kee, Conrad) Modified on 6/17/2019 by correcting the filing receipt information (tlh).
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Defendant Identisys Incorporated is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bahr v. Identisys Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Identisys Incorporated
Represented By: Conrad S. Kee
Represented By: Audrey S. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jana Bahr
Represented By: Michele Anderson-West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?