Jensen et al v. Xlear et al
Plaintiff: Jessica McCartney and Baylee Jensen
Defendant: William Robbs and Xlear
Case Number: 2:2019cv00413
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 22 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Baylee Jensen, Jessica McCartney. (Andrus, Randy)
August 6, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #13 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (nl)
August 5, 2019 Filing 20 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs Baylee Jensen, Jessica McCartney. (nl)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Continue Deadlines Set Forth In Order To Propose Schedule. After the Court resolves Defendant Xlear's Partial Motion to Dismiss Complaint Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) (ECF No. 11), the parties will have fourteen (14) days to meet and confer and provide either one of the following: (1) a signed Attorney Planning Meeting Report and a stipulated Proposed Scheduling Order, or (2) to otherwise comply with Paragraph 2 of the Courts Order to Propose Schedule #5 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 7/30/2019. (nl)
July 30, 2019 Filing 18 Stipulated MOTION to Continue Deadlines Set Forth in Order to Propose Schedule and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Xlear. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Continue Deadlines Set Forth in Order to Propose Schedule)(Curtis, Brennan)
July 25, 2019 Filing 17 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Xlear. (nl)
July 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Taryn N. Evans on behalf of Xlear (Evans, Taryn)
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Okazaki on behalf of Xlear (Okazaki, Kenneth)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Tolman on behalf of Xlear (Tolman, Mark)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Baylee Jensen, Jessica McCartney, Defendants William Robbs, Xlear. Form due by 8/5/2019. (las)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Baylee Jensen, Jessica McCartney, Defendants William Robbs, Xlear. (las)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Xlear. Attorney Brennan J. Curtis added to party Xlear(pty:dft)(Curtis, Brennan)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Baylee Jensen, Jessica McCartney as to William Robbs Waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Andrus, Randy)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Baylee Jensen, Jessica McCartney as to Xlear Waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Andrus, Randy)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Christopher Moon on behalf of William Robbs (Moon, M.)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Conrad S. Kee on behalf of William Robbs (Kee, Conrad)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to William Robbs. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 6/18/2019. (las)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to William Robbs. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Xlear. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Damages (Jury Trial Demanded) against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3302587) filed by Baylee Jensen, Jessica McCartney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Notice of Right to Sue - Baylee Jensen, #3 Exhibit B Notice of Right to Sue - Jessica McCartney) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Andrus, Randy)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiffs Baylee Jensen and Jessica McCartney are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jensen et al v. Xlear et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Robbs
Represented By: Conrad S. Kee
Represented By: M. Christopher Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xlear
Represented By: Taryn N. Evans
Represented By: Kenneth A. Okazaki
Represented By: Mark D. Tolman
Represented By: Brennan J. Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica McCartney
Represented By: Randy M. Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baylee Jensen
Represented By: Randy M. Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?