McCraw v. Truvision Health
Plaintiff: Sabra McCraw
Defendant: Truvision Health
Case Number: 2:2019cv00417
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Referring Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Q. Wood on behalf of Truvision Health (Wood, Stephen)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Truvision Health. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - TruVision Health Policies and Procedures, #2 Exhibit B - May 1, 2019 Letter from Brent Manning to Jared Asbury, #3 Exhibit C - April 8, 2019 Letter from Eric Olvera to Sabra McCraw, #4 Exhibit D - April 15, 2019 Letter from Brent Manning to David Brown, #5 Exhibit E - April 26, 2019 Letter from Jared Asbury to Brent Manning, #6 Exhibit F - May 13, 2019 Letter from Brent Manning to Jared Asbury, #7 Exhibit G - June 17, 2019 Letter from Brent Manning to Jared Asbury, #8 Exhibit H - June 24, 2019 Letter from Mary Anne Wood to Brent Manning) Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Wood, Mary Anne)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A). Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 07/25/2019. (tdp)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 Amended Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Truvision Health answer due 8/14/2019. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 07/25/2019. (kpf)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Truvision Health. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Mary Anne Q. Wood added to party Truvision Health(pty:dft)(Wood, Mary Anne)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Truvision Health. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Truvision Health with Jury Demand. filed by Sabra McCraw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EOlvera to SMcCraw 04.08.19, #2 Exhibit B - Letter from BManning to DBrown 04.15.19 w/ Ex. 1 (April 8 Letter from TruVision), #3 Exhibit C - BManning to JAsbury 05.13.19) (Manning, Brent)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - on or before July 11, 2019, Plaintiff shall plead the citizenship of each member of TruVision Health to show diversity. Otherwise this case will be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 6/20/19. (jmr)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Truvision Health (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3303471) filed by Sabra McCraw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EOlvera to SMcCraw - 04.08.19, #2 Exhibit B - BManning Letter to DBrown - 04.15.19 (attaching Ex. 1, 04.08.19 Letter from TruVision), #3 Exhibit C - BManning Letter to JAsbury - 05.13.19, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (Manning, Brent)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Plaintiff Sabra McCraw is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCraw v. Truvision Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truvision Health
Represented By: Mary Anne Q. Wood
Represented By: Stephen Q. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabra McCraw
Represented By: John T. Nelson
Represented By: Brent V. Manning
Represented By: Christopher F. Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?