Attwood v. Knight Adjustment Bureau et al
Plaintiff: William Attwood
Defendant: Jay Barney PC, Jay V. Barney and Knight Adjustment Bureau
Case Number: 2:2019cv00419
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Jay V. Barney, Jay Barney PC, Knight Adjustment Bureau (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Offer of Judgment) (Leeman, Alex)
August 6, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #14 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (nl)
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff William Attwood. (nl)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff William Attwood, Defendants Jay V. Barney, Jay Barney PC, Knight Adjustment Bureau. Form due by 8/2/2019. (las)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff William Attwood, Defendants Jay V. Barney, Jay Barney PC, Knight Adjustment Bureau. (las)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Jay V. Barney, Jay Barney PC, Knight Adjustment Bureau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Collection Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 - Collection Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Collection Answer and Counterclaim, #4 Exhibit 4 - Collection Settlement Stipulation, #5 Exhibit 5 - Collection Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit 6 - Collection Order of Dismissal)(Leeman, Alex)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley W. Madsen on behalf of Knight Adjustment Bureau (Madsen, Bradley)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex B. Leeman on behalf of Jay V. Barney, Jay Barney PC (Leeman, Alex)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Attwood as to Knight Adjustment Bureau served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Gilmore, Grant)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Attwood as to Jay V. Barney served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Gilmore, Grant)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #6 Certificate of Service. The document Certificate of Service. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading as Summons Returned Executed, separately one for each defendant. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (nl)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 ENTERED IN ERROR CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William Attwood Proof of Service Knight Adjustment Bureau (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proof of Service - Jay Barney)(Gilmore, Grant) Modified on 7/5/2019 stricken for improper filing event, plaintiff to refile(nl).
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 6/19/2019. (las)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Knight Adjustment Bureau. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jay Barney PC. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT William Attwood against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3304217) filed by William Attwood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Attwood Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Gilmore, Grant)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff William Attwood is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Attwood v. Knight Adjustment Bureau et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Barney PC
Represented By: Alex B. Leeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay V. Barney
Represented By: Alex B. Leeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Adjustment Bureau
Represented By: Bradley W. Madsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Attwood
Represented By: Grant D. Gilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?