Tandoh v. Cuccinelli
Plaintiff: Theophilus E. Tandoh
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Case Number: 2:2019cv00421
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Referring Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 8/16/2019. (reb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John David Swaim on behalf of Theophilus E. Tandoh (Swaim, John)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John David Swaim for Theophilus E. Tandoh. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 6/19/2019. (las)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Plaintiff's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John David Swaim Attorney for Plaintiff, Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3304606, filed by Plaintiff Theophilus E. Tandoh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF Registration Form, #2 Exhibit Application for Admission, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Barron, Robert)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Kenneth T. Cuccinelli (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-33-4508) filed by Theophilus E. Tandoh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit "A", #3 Exhibit Exhibit "B", #4 Exhibit Exhibit "C", #5 Exhibit Exhibit "D", #6 Exhibit Exhibit "E") Assigned to Judge Dee Benson (Barron, Robert)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dee Benson. Plaintiff Theophilus E. Tandoh is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tandoh v. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theophilus E. Tandoh
Represented By: Robert J. Barron
Represented By: John David Swaim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?