Skullcandy v. Sterling
Plaintiff: Skullcandy
Defendant: Irena Sterling
Case Number: 2:2019cv00424
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Referring Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 8/16/2019. (las)
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Complaint and Summons served on Irena Sterling on 07/26/2019, filed by Plaintiff Skullcandy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Messaging Center Correspondence)(Miner, Arryn)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Arryn K. Miner for Skullcandy. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 7/29/2019. (las)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William D. Kloss, Jr. for Skullcandy. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 7/29/2019. (las)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Arryn K. Miner , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3331277, filed by Plaintiff Skullcandy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Call, Monica)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William D. Kloss, Jr. , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3329036, filed by Plaintiff Skullcandy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Call, Monica)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting #9 Motion for Alternative Service of Process. Plaintiff may serve Defendant by delivering a copy of the Complaint and summonsvia Amazons messaging service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 7/16/2019. (las)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Service of Process. Summons to be served on: Irena Sterling and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Skullcandy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Non-Service, #2 Exhibit B - General Nutrition Order, #3 Exhibit C - Otter Order, #4 Exhibit D - Pure Encapsulations Order, #5 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Call, Monica)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Irena Sterling. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Irena Sterling. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Marcel C. Duhamel, for Plaintiff Skullcandy (tlh)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney William D. Kloss, Jr., Rodney A. Holaday and Arryn K. Miner, for Plaintiff Skullcandy. (tlh)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (tlh)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 6/20/2019. (tco)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Irena Sterling (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3306080) filed by Skullcandy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Ted Stewart (Call, Monica)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Ted Stewart. Plaintiff Skullcandy is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skullcandy v. Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irena Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skullcandy
Represented By: Monica S. Call
Represented By: Arryn K. Miner
Represented By: William D. Kloss, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?