Hunter Killer Productions v. Cowlishaw et al.
Plaintiff: Hunter Killer Productions
Defendant: Internet Subscribers 1-12, Ivan Sosa, Andy Sevilliano, Sarah Siale, Forseys Laundry and Dry, Jonathan Cowlishaw, Kimberly Brown, Budget Inn Ogden, Georgina Dionicio, Jeff Willis and Stacie Carver
Case Number: 2:2019cv00430
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Kimberly Brown, IP 24.11.95.63, without prejudice filed by Plaintiff Hunter Killer Productions (Zenger, Todd)
August 13, 2019 Filing 22 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jeff Willis. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (alt)
August 13, 2019 Filing 21 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Ivan Sosa. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (alt)
August 13, 2019 Filing 20 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Sarah Siale. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (alt)
August 13, 2019 Filing 19 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Andy Sevilliano. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (alt)
August 13, 2019 Filing 18 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Forseys Laundry and Dry. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (alt)
August 13, 2019 Filing 17 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Georgina Dionicio. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (alt)
August 13, 2019 Filing 16 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jonathan Cowlishaw. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (alt)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Stacie Carver. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (alt)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Budget Inn Ogden. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (alt)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Kimberly Brown. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (alt)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Internet Subscribers 1-12 with Jury Demand. New Defendants: Jonathan Cowlishaw, Kimberly Brown, Ivan Sosa, Forseys Laundry & Dry, Jeff Willis, Georgina Dionicio, Sarah Siale, Stacie Carver, Andy Sevillano, Budget Inn Ogden. Removed Defendants: Internet Subscribers 1-12. filed by Hunter Killer Productions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit B - IP Information) (Zenger, Todd)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying #8 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 7/31/19 (alt)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of IP 73.65.152.187, Internet Subscriber 9, With Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Hunter Killer Productions (Zenger, Todd)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Sent to Comcast filed by Plaintiff Hunter Killer Productions. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order.)(Zenger, Todd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 Pro Se MOTION to Quash Subpoena Sent to Comcast filed by Movant Sarah Siale (Attachments: #1 Appendix of related documents) (alt)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of IP 76.27.55.35, Internet Subscriber 3, With Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Hunter Killer Productions (Zenger, Todd)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Limited Discovery. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 6/26/19 (alt)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Report on the Filing of an action mailed to the Register of Copyrights Office. (nl)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Daniel Arheidt in Support re #3 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Discovery and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Hunter Killer Productions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Regional IP Data)(Zenger, Todd)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Discovery and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Hunter Killer Productions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit B - Subscriber Data, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Zenger, Todd)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Internet Subscribers 1-12 (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3307109) filed by Hunter Killer Productions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit B - IP Information, #3 Civil Cover Sheet.) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Zenger, Todd)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiff Hunter Killer Productions is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter Killer Productions v. Cowlishaw et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter Killer Productions
Represented By: Todd E. Zenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internet Subscribers 1-12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivan Sosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Sevilliano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Siale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forseys Laundry and Dry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Cowlishaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Budget Inn Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgina Dionicio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacie Carver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?