Suda v. Hase et al

Plaintiff: Linda Suda
Defendant: Christopher Ward Hase and Denese Silcox Hase
Case Number: 2:2019cv00431
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12188
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 Case randomly assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups per 11 docket text order. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED: Plaintiff has moved for entry of default against Defendants Christopher Ward Hase #8 and Denese Silcox Hase #9 . Neither Defendant has appeared or opposed the Motions for Entry of Default #10 . Because consent to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge by all parties is not feasible at this time, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 8/12/2019. (nas)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #9 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Denese Silcox Hase , #8 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Christopher Ward Hase filed by Plaintiff Linda Suda. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Default Certificate, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Default Certificate)(Crane, Matthew)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Denese Silcox Hase filed by Plaintiff Linda Suda. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Default Certificate)(Crane, Matthew)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Christopher Ward Hase filed by Plaintiff Linda Suda. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Default Certificate)(Crane, Matthew)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Suda as to Denese Silcox Hase served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Crane, Matthew)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Suda as to Christopher Ward Hase served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Crane, Matthew)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 6/24/2019. (las)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Denese Silcox Hase. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Christopher Ward Hase. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Christopher Ward Hase, Denese Silcox Hase (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3307128) filed by Linda Suda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Crane, Matthew)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff Linda Suda is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suda v. Hase et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Ward Hase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denese Silcox Hase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Suda
Represented By: Matthew B. Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?