Jones v. Western Trails Charters & Tours et al
Plaintiff: Marian Hatfield Jones
Defendant: Western Trails Charters & Tours and Marvin Kay Gunderson
Case Number: 2:2019cv00433
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Referring Judge: Ted Stewart
2 Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 7/29/2019. (lil)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Ted Stewart. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #4 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (nl)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Western Trails Charters & Tours. (nl)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Western Trails Charters & Tours identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Snow, Tyler)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Marvin Kay Gunderson.(Snow, Tyler)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Western Trails Charters & Tours.(Snow, Tyler)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 6/28/2019. (las)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Marian Hatfield Jones. (las)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 File Received from Third District Court - Salt Lake, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket and State Court Documents. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Waiver of Service, #4 Notice of Removal) (las)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Marvin Kay Gunderson, Western Trails Charters & Tours, Plaintiff Marian Hatfield Jones. Form due by 7/8/2019. (nl)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Marvin Kay Gunderson, Western Trails Charters & Tours, Plaintiff Marian Hatfield Jones. (nl)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court, Salt Lake County, case number 190902815, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3307288) filed by Marvin Kay Gunderson, Western Trails Charters & Tours. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Snow, Tyler)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Defendants Marvin Kay Gunderson, Western Trails Charters & Tours is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Western Trails Charters & Tours et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Hatfield Jones
Represented By: Charles E. Danny Frazier, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Trails Charters & Tours
Represented By: Tyler V. Snow
Represented By: Kristen C. Kiburtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Kay Gunderson
Represented By: Tyler V. Snow
Represented By: Kristen C. Kiburtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?