Quest Solution et al v. Redlpr LLC et al
Plaintiff: HTS Image Processing, HTS USA and Quest Solution
Defendant: Redlpr LLC, Jeremy James MC Michael Barker and Sagy Amit
Case Number: 2:2019cv00437
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Referring Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 21 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
August 21, 2019 Filing 20 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Sagy Amit, Jeremy James MC Michael Barker, Redlpr LLC. (nl)
August 12, 2019 Filing 19 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs HTS Image Processing, HTS USA, Quest Solution. (nl)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Levi Y. Silver for Sagy Amit, Jeremy James MC Michael Barker, and Redlpr LLC. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 8/1/2019. (nl)
August 6, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Levi Y. Silver and Consent of Local Counsel, Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3342261, filed by Defendants Sagy Amit, Jeremy James MC Michael Barker, Redlpr LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(Thomas, Nathan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Sagy Amit, Jeremy James MC Michael Barker, Redlpr LLC, Plaintiffs HTS Image Processing, HTS USA, Quest Solution. Form due by 8/21/2019. (nl)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Sagy Amit, Jeremy James MC Michael Barker, Redlpr LLC. Attorney Nathan D. Thomas added to party Sagy Amit(pty:dft), Attorney Nathan D. Thomas added to party Jeremy James MC Michael Barker(pty:dft), Attorney Nathan D. Thomas added to party Redlpr LLC(pty:dft)(Thomas, Nathan)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time To Propose Schedule. The parties will have up to 14 days from the date counsel for Defendants files an appearance in this case to meet and confer regarding a Proposed Scheduling Order pursuant to this Courts Order to Propose Schedule dated 6/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 8/01/2019. (nl)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time Order To Propose Schedule filed by Plaintiffs HTS Image Processing, HTS USA, Quest Solution. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Reinitz, Ariel)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 6/28/2019. (las)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ariel Reinitz for HTS Image Processing,Ariel Reinitz for HTS USA,Ariel Reinitz for Quest Solution. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 6/26/2019. (las)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quest Solution, HTS Image Processing, HTS USA as to Sagy Amit served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Burton, H.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quest Solution, HTS Image Processing, HTS USA as to Redlpr LLC served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Burton, H.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quest Solution, HTS Image Processing, HTS USA as to Jeremy James MC Michael Barker served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Burton, H.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jeremy James MC Michael Barker. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Sagy Amit. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Redlpr LLC. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Ariel Reinitz, for Plaintiffs HTS Image Processing, HTS USA, Quest Solution. (nl)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ariel Reinitz , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3308294, filed by Plaintiffs HTS Image Processing, HTS USA, Quest Solution. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Burton, H.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3308271) filed by Quest Solution, HTS USA, HTS Image Processing. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Burton, H.) Modified on 6/24/2019 to add HTS Image Processing as a filer (nl).
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiffs HTS Image Processing, HTS USA, Quest Solution is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quest Solution et al v. Redlpr LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HTS Image Processing
Represented By: H. Dickson Burton
Represented By: James C. Watson
Represented By: Ariel Reinitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HTS USA
Represented By: H. Dickson Burton
Represented By: James C. Watson
Represented By: Ariel Reinitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quest Solution
Represented By: H. Dickson Burton
Represented By: James C. Watson
Represented By: Ariel Reinitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redlpr LLC
Represented By: Nathan D. Thomas
Represented By: Levi Y. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy James MC Michael Barker
Represented By: Nathan D. Thomas
Represented By: Levi Y. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sagy Amit
Represented By: Nathan D. Thomas
Represented By: Levi Y. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?