Hawkins v. Riverton City Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Dallin Hawkins
Defendant: Riverton City Police Department and Angie Oldham
Not Yet Classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 2:2019cv00442
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Referring Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: Riverton Police Department and Angie Oldham filed by Plaintiff Dallin Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(kpf)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 2nd MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Dallin Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(kpf)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to issue a Subpoena filed by Plaintiff Dallin Hawkins. Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(kpf)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Dallin Hawkins. Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(kpf)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: Riverton City Police Department, Officer Angie Oldham filed by Plaintiff Dallin Hawkins. Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(kpf)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/17/19. (ss)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Angie Oldham, Riverton City Police Department (Originally received by the court on 06/24/2019). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Dallin Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope ) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (tlh)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. Collection of Fees Sent: No; denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying #3 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 06/27/2019. (tlh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: Riverton City Police Department and Angie Oldham filed by Plaintiff Dallin Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order )(tlh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Dallin Hawkins. (tlh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 06/24/2019) filed by Plaintiff Dallin Hawkins. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Riverton City Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverton City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallin Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?