Descanzo et al v. Grand America Hotel & Resorts et al
Plaintiff: Marianne Ponio, Jann Descanzo, Veronica Bondoc, Glen Segundino, Marvin Bryan Occenola Salazar, Abby Mariel Dignos Grondahl and Madelyn Noble Brennan
Defendant: Grand America Hotel & Resorts and Sinclair Service
Case Number: 2:2019cv00443
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Jayne Nelson on behalf of Grand America Hotel & Resorts, Sinclair Service (Nelson, Megan)
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Jeremy Adamson on behalf of Grand America Hotel & Resorts, Sinclair Service (Adamson, R.)
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. Lewis on behalf of Grand America Hotel & Resorts, Sinclair Service (Lewis, Matthew)
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF FILING of Abby Mariel Dignos Grondahl Consent to Join filed by Plaintiffs Veronica Bondoc, Jann Descanzo, Marianne Ponio, Glen Segundino. (Nusser, Erika)
August 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF FILING of Bryan Occenola Salazar Consent to Join filed by Plaintiffs Veronica Bondoc, Jann Descanzo, Marianne Ponio, Glen Segundino. (Nusser, Erika)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF FILING of Madelyn Noble Brennan Consent to Join filed by Plaintiffs Veronica Bondoc, Jann Descanzo, Marianne Ponio, Glen Segundino. (Nusser, Erika)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Beth E. Terrell for Veronica Bondoc,Beth E. Terrell for Jann Descanzo,Beth E. Terrell for Marianne Ponio,Beth E. Terrell for Glen Segundino. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 7/17/2019. (las)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Erika Nusser for Veronica Bondoc,Erika Nusser for Jann Descanzo,Erika Nusser for Marianne Ponio,Erika Nusser for Glen Segundino. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 7/17/2019. (las)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher M. Lapining for Veronica Bondoc,Christopher M. Lapining for Jann Descanzo,Christopher M. Lapining for Marianne Ponio,Christopher M. Lapining for Glen Segundino. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 7/17/2019. (las)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alexander Neville Hood for Veronica Bondoc,Alexander Neville Hood for Jann Descanzo,Alexander Neville Hood for Marianne Ponio,Alexander Neville Hood for Glen Segundino. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 7/17/2019. (las)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alexander Hood , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3326353, filed by Plaintiffs Veronica Bondoc, Jann Descanzo, Marianne Ponio, Glen Segundino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McBean, P.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher M. Lapinig , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3326275, filed by Plaintiffs Veronica Bondoc, Jann Descanzo, Marianne Ponio, Glen Segundino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McBean, P.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Beth E. Terrell , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3326237, filed by Plaintiffs Veronica Bondoc, Jann Descanzo, Marianne Ponio, Glen Segundino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McBean, P.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Erika L. Nusser , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3326192, filed by Plaintiffs Veronica Bondoc, Jann Descanzo, Marianne Ponio, Glen Segundino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McBean, P.)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Sinclair Service. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Grand America Hotel & Resorts. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3309492) filed by Jann Descanzo, Veronica Bondoc, Marianne Ponio, Glen Segundino. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1- FLSA Consent Forms, #3 Exhibit 2- Descanzo Internship Plan, #4 Exhibit 3- Bonduc Internship Plan, #5 Exhibit 4- Segundino Internship Plan, #6 Exhibit 5- Ponio Internship Plan, #7 Exhibit 6-Paystub Showing Hours Worked) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (McBean, P.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Plaintiffs Veronica Bondoc, Jann Descanzo, Marianne Ponio and Glen Segundino are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Descanzo et al v. Grand America Hotel & Resorts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand America Hotel & Resorts
Represented By: R. Jeremy Adamson
Represented By: Matthew R. Lewis
Represented By: Megan Jayne Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinclair Service
Represented By: R. Jeremy Adamson
Represented By: Matthew R. Lewis
Represented By: Megan Jayne Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianne Ponio
Represented By: P. Alex McBean
Represented By: Beth E. Terrell
Represented By: Alexander N. Hood
Represented By: Erika L. Nusser
Represented By: Christopher M. Lapinig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jann Descanzo
Represented By: P. Alex McBean
Represented By: Beth E. Terrell
Represented By: Alexander N. Hood
Represented By: Erika L. Nusser
Represented By: Christopher M. Lapinig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Bondoc
Represented By: P. Alex McBean
Represented By: Beth E. Terrell
Represented By: Alexander N. Hood
Represented By: Erika L. Nusser
Represented By: Christopher M. Lapinig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Segundino
Represented By: P. Alex McBean
Represented By: Beth E. Terrell
Represented By: Alexander N. Hood
Represented By: Erika L. Nusser
Represented By: Christopher M. Lapinig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Bryan Occenola Salazar
Represented By: P. Alex McBean
Represented By: Beth E. Terrell
Represented By: Alexander N. Hood
Represented By: Erika L. Nusser
Represented By: Christopher M. Lapinig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abby Mariel Dignos Grondahl
Represented By: P. Alex McBean
Represented By: Beth E. Terrell
Represented By: Alexander N. Hood
Represented By: Erika L. Nusser
Represented By: Christopher M. Lapinig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madelyn Noble Brennan
Represented By: P. Alex McBean
Represented By: Beth E. Terrell
Represented By: Alexander N. Hood
Represented By: Erika L. Nusser
Represented By: Christopher M. Lapinig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?