Latour v. Deseret First Credit Union
Plaintiff: Elias Latour
Defendant: Deseret First Credit Union
Case Number: 2:2019cv00450
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1691
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Deseret First Credit Union. (nl)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Deseret First Credit Union, Plaintiff Elias Latour. Form due by 8/27/2019. (nl)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deseret First Credit Union re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support (Kaas, Adam)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Deseret First Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Action Taken and Statement of Reasons, #2 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Adam M. Kaas added to party Deseret First Credit Union(pty:dft)(Kaas, Adam)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Deseret First Credit Union (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4681086825) (Fee Status: PAID) filed by Elias Latour. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Latour v. Deseret First Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elias Latour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deseret First Credit Union
Represented By: Adam M. Kaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?