Intermountain Health Care v. Brett Luddington Inc
Plaintiff: Intermountain Health Care
Defendant: Brett Luddington Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00456
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Referring Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 Motions No Longer Referred: #8 MOTION for Entry of Default (mjw)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Intermountain Health Care. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order ) Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Howell, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 8/7/2019. (mjm)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intermountain Health Care as to Brett Luddington Inc served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Howell, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Intermountain Health Care. (Howell, Michael)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nl)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Brett Luddington Inc. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Brett Luddington Inc (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3312680) filed by Intermountain Health Care. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Trademark Reg. 2733735, #2 Exhibit 2-Trademark Reg 3309180, #3 Exhibit 3-Trademark Reg 3309183, #4 Exhibit 4-Business Reg, #5 Exhibit 5-Letter of Cancellation, #6 Exhibit 6-Whois Reg, #7 Exhibit 7-Letter April 2017, #8 Exhibit 8-Email Jan. 2018, #9 Exhibit 9-Letter March 2018, #10 Exhibit 10-Letter May 2019, #11 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (Howell, Michael)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Plaintiff Intermountain Health Care is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intermountain Health Care v. Brett Luddington Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intermountain Health Care
Represented By: Michael J. Howell
Represented By: Alexis Keiko Juergens
Represented By: Charles J. Veverka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Luddington Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?