B. et al v. Regence Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Utah et al
Plaintiff: Julie B. and Julian B.
Defendant: Landesk Software Inc Medical Plan, Regence Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Utah, Ivanti Medical Plan and Ivanti
Case Number: 2:2019cv00471
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Julian B., Julie B., Defendants Ivanti, Ivanti Medical Plan, Landesk Software Inc Medical Plan, Regence Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Utah. Form due by 9/16/2019. (nl)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Ivanti answer due 10/9/2019; Ivanti Medical Plan answer due 10/9/2019; Landesk Software Inc Medical Plan answer due 10/9/2019; Regence Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Utah answer due 10/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/30/2019. (nl)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendants Ivanti, Ivanti Medical Plan, Landesk Software Inc Medical Plan, Regence Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Utah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) Attorney Bentley J. Tolk added to party Ivanti(pty:dft), Attorney Bentley J. Tolk added to party Ivanti Medical Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Bentley J. Tolk added to party Landesk Software Inc Medical Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Bentley J. Tolk added to party Regence Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Utah(pty:dft)(Tolk, Bentley)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Julian B., Julie B. as to Regence Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Utah Waiver sent on 7/5/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (King, Brian)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Julian B., Julie B. as to Ivanti Waiver sent on 7/5/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (King, Brian)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Julian B., Julie B. as to Ivanti Medical Plan Waiver sent on 7/5/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (King, Brian)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Julian B., Julie B. as to Landesk Software Inc Medical Plan Waiver sent on 7/5/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (King, Brian)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/8/2019. (nl)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Ivanti, Ivanti Medical Plan, Landesk Software Inc Medical Plan, Regence Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Utah (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3317488) filed by Julian B., Julie B.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (King, Brian)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiffs Julian B., Julie B. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B. et al v. Regence Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Utah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landesk Software Inc Medical Plan
Represented By: Bentley J. Tolk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regence Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Utah
Represented By: Bentley J. Tolk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivanti Medical Plan
Represented By: Bentley J. Tolk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivanti
Represented By: Bentley J. Tolk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie B.
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nediha Hadzikadunic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian B.
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nediha Hadzikadunic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?