Ouzounian v. Unum Life Insurance
Plaintiff: George R. Ouzounian
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance and Unum Group
Case Number: 2:2019cv00472
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Referring Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss : (Notice generated by chambers) Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Rm 3.400 before Judge Tena Campbell. (cff)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Unum Life Insurance. (Kelley, David)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 The deadline for submission of Consent/Reassignment forms has now passed. One or more of the parties did not file, therefore the case is no longer eligible for magistrate assignment. Case randomly assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff George R. Ouzounian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Denial letter, #2 Exhibit Demand, #3 Exhibit Request for Info, #4 Exhibit Production of Info, #5 Exhibit Denial letter, #6 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint)(Taylor, Mark)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion To Extend Deadline For Filing Of The Attorney Planning Meeting Report. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties will submit their Attorney Planning Meeting Report and proposed Scheduling Order within ten (10) days of the entry of a decision on the Defendants Motion to Dismiss #7 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 7/31/2019. (nl)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time Filing of the Attorney Planning Meeting Report and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Unum Life Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Attorney Planning Meeting Report Deadline)(Kelley, David)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Unum Life Insurance. (las)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #4 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (las)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Unum Life Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Group Life ADD Policy)(Petersen, Scott)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 7/8/2019. (nl)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 File Received from 3rd District, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket and filings from state court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (nl)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff George R. Ouzounian, Defendant Unum Life Insurance. Form due by 7/22/2019. (nl)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff George R. Ouzounian, Defendant Unum Life Insurance. (nl)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court, case number 190904799, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3317275) filed by Unum Life Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Petersen, Scott)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Defendant Unum Life Insurance is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ouzounian v. Unum Life Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance
Represented By: David N. Kelley
Represented By: Scott M. Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group
Represented By: David N. Kelley
Represented By: Scott M. Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George R. Ouzounian
Represented By: Mark R. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?