R. et al v. United Healthcare Insurance et al
Plaintiff: B. C., Laurel R. and Troy R.
Defendant: Pfizer Medical Plan, the and United Healthcare Insurance
Case Number: 2:2019cv00473
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Pfizer Medical Plan, the answer due 10/3/2019; United Healthcare Insurance answer due 10/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/30/2019. (nl)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs B. C., Laurel R., Troy R., Defendants Pfizer Medical Plan, the, United Healthcare Insurance. Form due by 9/16/2019. (nl)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Pfizer Medical Plan, the, United Healthcare Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Extending Answer Deadline) Attorney Clint R. Hansen added to party Pfizer Medical Plan, the(pty:dft), Attorney Clint R. Hansen added to party United Healthcare Insurance(pty:dft)(Hansen, Clint)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Laurel R., B. C., Troy R. as to United Healthcare Insurance Waiver sent on 7/5/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (King, Brian)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Laurel R., B. C., Troy R. as to Pfizer Medical Plan, the Waiver sent on 7/5/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (King, Brian)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/8/2019. (nl)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Pfizer Medical Plan, the, United Healthcare Insurance (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3317493) filed by Laurel R., B. C., Troy R.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (King, Brian)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiffs B. C., Laurel R., Troy R. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R. et al v. United Healthcare Insurance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Medical Plan, the
Represented By: Clint R. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance
Represented By: Clint R. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. C.
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nediha Hadzikadunic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurel R.
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nediha Hadzikadunic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy R.
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nediha Hadzikadunic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?