Hundley v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Plaintiff: Stephanie A. Hundley
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00483
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Referring Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order in ERISA Case)(Englert, Jack)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen (14) days. Within twenty-one (21) days, the parties shall meet and confer. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 8/19/2019. (jds)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 8/16/2019. (reb)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Englert, Jack)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jack M. Englert, Jr for Life Insurance Company of North America. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 7/15/2019. (jds)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jack M. Englert, Jr. , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3323649, filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnett, James)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Stephanie A. Hundley and Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (tlh)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth District Court (American Fork), Utah County, case number 190100120, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3320286) filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Declaration of Kellie Downey, #3 Exhibit C: Summons and Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit D: Copy of State Court Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Dee Benson (Barnett, James)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dee Benson. Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hundley v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: James L. Barnett
Represented By: Jack M. Englert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie A. Hundley
Represented By: Andrew J. Reichardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?