Hawkins v. Salt Lake County Jail et al
Defendant: Salt Lake County Sheriff's Office, Salt Lake County Jail and Salt Lake County Adult Detention Center
Petitioner: Dallin Hawkins
Not Yet Classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 2:2019cv00490
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Referring Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Judge Bruce S. Jenkins recused. Case reassigned to Judge Clark Waddoups for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 8/26/19. (jmr)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: Salt Lake County Jail and SL County Sheriffs Office filed by Petitioner Dallin Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(kpf)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Petitioner Dallin Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State, under 28 U.S.C. 2241 ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 4681087158) Fee Status: Paid. filed by Dallin Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope ) Assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins (tlh)
July 22, 2019 Initial Prisoner Filing Fee: $ 5.00 received, receipt number 4681087158 (tlh)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If Petitioner does not pay the five-dollar filing fee within thirty days, the petition will not be filed and the case will be closed. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 7/16/19. (jmr)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Dallin Hawkins received from Correctional Institution (tlh)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 07/12/2019) filed by Petitioner Dallin Hawkins. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Salt Lake County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dallin Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt Lake County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt Lake County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt Lake County Adult Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?