Hawkins v. Salt Lake County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Dallin Hawkins
Defendant: FNU Truong, Salt Lake County Sheriff's Office, FNU Armbruster, FNU Kimber, FNU Welch, FNU Shaw, Salt Lake County Adult Detention Center, Salt Lake County Jail, FNU Berrett, FNU Wolfgramm, FNU Turner and FNU Steigal
Not Yet Classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 2:2019cv00491
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dale A Kimball
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE VACATING Status Conference HEARING set for 10/3/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Notice generated by EJF Chambers) (lnp)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(B). The Plaintiff in this case is a pro se prisoner litigant and so this case is referred to the Prisoner Litigation Unit rather than to a magistrate. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 8/27/2019. (eat)
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against FNU Armbruster, FNU Berrett, FNU Kimber, Salt Lake County Adult Detention Center, Salt Lake County Jail, Salt Lake County Sheriff's Office, FNU Shaw, FNU Steigal, FNU Truong, FNU Turner, FNU Welch, FNU Wolfgramm. filed by Dallin Hawkins. (kpf)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by EJF Chambers) Status Conference set for 10/3/2019 at 10:00 AM in Rm 7.400 before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. (lnp)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Appoint Counsel; and denying #9 Motion to Issue Subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 8/7/2019. (eat)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to issue Subpoenas filed by Plaintiff Dallin Hawkins. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(kpf)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Dallin Hawkins. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(kpf)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 8/1/2019. (eat)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Originally received by the court on 07/12/2019). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Dallin Hawkins. Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (tlh)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: $8.00. If initial partial fee is not paid within 30 days, the case will be dismissed. Collection of Fees Sent: Yes; denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying #4 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 07/22/2019. (tlh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: Salt Lake County Sheriffs Office, Salt Lake County Jail, Salt Lake County Adult Detention Center, Officer Kimber, Officer Troung, Officer Armbruster, Sergeant Shaw, Sergeant Welch and Lietenant Berrett filed by Plaintiff Dallin Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order )(tlh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Dallin Hawkins. (tlh)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Dallin Hawkins received from Correctional Institution (tlh)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 07/12/2019) filed by Plaintiff Dallin Hawkins. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Salt Lake County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Truong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt Lake County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Armbruster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Kimber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt Lake County Adult Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt Lake County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Berrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Wolfgramm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Steigal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallin Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?