Velazquez v. Greyhound Lines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Clemente Velazquez
Defendant: Greyhound Lines, Inc. and Charles Saunders
Case Number: 2:2019cv00493
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/1/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 6/3/2020. Discovery due by 3/3/2021. Motions due by 4/3/2021. Status Conference set for 4/8/2021 at 10:00 AM in Rm 7.300 before Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/10/2019. (las)
September 6, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Swindle, Ken)
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott T. Evans on behalf of Greyhound Lines, Inc., Charles Saunders (Evans, Scott)
August 26, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen D. Kelson on behalf of Greyhound Lines, Inc., Charles Saunders (Kelson, Stephen)
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint filed by Greyhound Lines, Inc., Charles Saunders. Attorney Stephen D. Kelson added to party Greyhound Lines, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen D. Kelson added to party Charles Saunders(pty:dft)(Kelson, Stephen)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clemente Velazquez as to Greyhound Lines, Inc. served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit Green Card, #3 Affidavit Summons, #4 Exhibit UT SOS)(Swindle, Ken)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clemente Velazquez as to Charles Saunders served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Return of Summons)(Swindle, Ken)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #10 Affidavit of Service. The document was filed incorrectly. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading as a Summons returned executed and to also attach a copy of the summons. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. (las)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Summons / Complaint served on Charles Saunders on August 5, 2019, filed by Plaintiff Clemente Velazquez. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Proof of Service)(Swindle, Ken)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/30/2019. (nl)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 7/29/2019. (las)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Charles Saunders. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Charles Saunders. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Greyhound Lines, Inc.. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ken David Swindle for Clemente Velazquez. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 7/16/2019. (las)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ken Swindle , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3324268, filed by Plaintiff Clemente Velazquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission, #2 Exhibit ECF Registration Form, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(North, Kara)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3324169) filed by Clemente Velazquez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (North, Kara)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Plaintiff Clemente Velazquez is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velazquez v. Greyhound Lines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clemente Velazquez
Represented By: Kara H. North
Represented By: Randall K. Spencer
Represented By: Ken D. Swindle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greyhound Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen D. Kelson
Represented By: Scott T. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Saunders
Represented By: Stephen D. Kelson
Represented By: Scott T. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?