Nordic Water Products AB et al v. Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support
Plaintiff: Nordic Water Products AB and Westech Engineering, Inc.
Defendant: Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support
Case Number: 2:2019cv00497
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Jill N Parrish
Referring Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 8/16/2019. (jds)
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/29/19. (ss)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/23/19. (ss)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Einar Stole for Nordic Water Products AB. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/22/2019. (jds)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Einar Stole , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3329872, filed by Plaintiff Nordic Water Products AB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Burton, H.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (rks)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David Andrew Wilson for Westech Engineering, Inc.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/16/2019. (jds)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Clifton E. McCann for Westech Engineering, Inc.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/16/2019. (jds)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David R. Jaglowski for Westech Engineering, Inc.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/16/2019. (jds)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David A. Wilson , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3325572, filed by Plaintiff Westech Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Burton, H.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 ERRATA to #4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Clifton E. McCann , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3325442, filed by Plaintiff Westech Engineering, Inc. Replacement ECF Form - Ex. B. (Burton, H.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Clifton E. McCann , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3325442, filed by Plaintiff Westech Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Burton, H.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David Jaglowski , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3325407, filed by Plaintiff Westech Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - ECF Registration Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Burton, H.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3324895) filed by Westech Engineering, Inc., Nordic Water Products AB. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet List of Attorneys for Plaintiffs, #3 Exhibit 1 - Patent Assignment to Veolia, #4 Exhibit 2 - 2019.01.30 Letter to C. McCann, et al., #5 Exhibit 3 - Veolia-WesTech-Nordic Water Settlement Agreement, #6 Exhibit 4 - 2019.03.06 Letter to L. Coats, #7 Exhibit 5 - 2019.03.12 Letter to E. Stole, #8 Exhibit 6 - 2019.03.18 Letter to L. Coats, #9 Exhibit 7 - 2019.04.10 Email re Veolia, WesTech and Nordic Water, #10 Exhibit 8 - 2019.04.30 - Veolia Dynadisc Infringement Chart, #11 Exhibit 9 - US 10188971 Danielsson, #12 Exhibit 10 - Non-Final Rejection, #13 Exhibit 11 - 785 Amendment, #14 Exhibit 12 - Examiner initiated interview summary, #15 Exhibit 13 - Notice of Allowance 785 patent, #16 Exhibit 14 - Answer and Counterclaims (Ex. A), #17 Exhibit 15 - Answer and Counterclaims (Ex. B), #18 Exhibit 16 - Answer and Counterclaim - (Ex. C), #19 Exhibit 17 - Answer and Counterclaims (Ex. D), #20 Exhibit 18 - 971 specification and claims, #21 Exhibit 19 - 971 amended claims) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Burton, H.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiffs Nordic Water Products AB and Westech Engineering, Inc. are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nordic Water Products AB et al v. Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nordic Water Products AB
Represented By: H. Dickson Burton
Represented By: James C. Watson
Represented By: Einar Stole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westech Engineering, Inc.
Represented By: H. Dickson Burton
Represented By: James C. Watson
Represented By: David Andrew Wilson
Represented By: Clifton E. McCann
Represented By: David R. Jaglowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?