Noor v. Barr et al

Plaintiff: Abdirashid Noor
Defendant: Andrew Lambrecht, Kevin A. McAleenan, Laura McNeer and William Barr
Case Number: 2:2019cv00498
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Laura McNeer. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Andrew Lambrecht. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Kevin A. McAleenan. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to William Barr; US Attorney for the District of UT. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to William Barr. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 Modification of Docket: Error: Complaint was e-mailed to the court on 07/16/2019 but the filing fee was not paid until 07/17/2019. Correction: Changed file date of the case to 07/17/2019. re #4 Complaint. (tlh)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3326340) filed by Abdirashid Noor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (Crayk, Adam)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #2 Plaintiff's MOTION for Hearing and Memorandum in Support of Hearing on Naturalization Application. The document was filed as a motion instead of a complaint. The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile the pleading using the Complaint event found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents and pay the filing fee of $400. The new pleading will receive a new document number on the docket. The motion for hearing has been termed. (rks) Modified by adding filing fee information on 7/17/2019 (rks).
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY ERROR - disregard, wrong event used Plaintiff's MOTION for Hearing and Memorandum in Support of Hearing on Naturalization Application filed by Plaintiff Abdirashid Noor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crayk, Adam) Modified by adding error text on 7/17/2019 (rks).
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Plaintiff Abdirashid Noor is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noor v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Lambrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin A. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura McNeer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdirashid Noor
Represented By: Adam L. Crayk
Represented By: Marti L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?