W. et al v. Health Net Life Insurance et al
Plaintiff: E. W. and I. W.
Defendant: Health Net Life Insurance and Health Net of Arizona
Case Number: 2:2019cv00499
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 16 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs E. W., I. W. (nl)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Health Net Life Insurance, Health Net of Arizona, Plaintiffs E. W., I. W.. Form due by 9/24/2019. (nl)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shaina Vinayek for Health Net Life Insurance and Health Net of Arizona. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/3/2019. (nl)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael W. Lieberman for Health Net Life Insurance and Health Net of Arizona. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/3/2019. (nl)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 Amended MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shaina Vinayek , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3360951, filed by Defendants Health Net Life Insurance, Health Net of Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission- Vinayek, #2 Exhibit A - Application - Vinayek, #3 Exhibit B - ECF - Vinayek)(Petersen, Scott) Modified on 9/3/2019 to correct receipt number(nl).
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 Amended MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael W. Lieberman , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3360969, filed by Defendants Health Net Life Insurance, Health Net of Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission Liebreman, #3 Exhibit B - ECF - Lieberman)(Petersen, Scott) Modified on 9/3/2019 to correct receipt number (nl).
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 Modification of Docket: Error: Counsel filed Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Health Net Life Insurance, but filed including a defendant not listed on the motion. Correction: Filing party Health Net of Arizona removed, re #6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael W. Lieberman, and #5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shaina Vinayek. (nl)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael W. Lieberman for Health Net Life Insurance. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 8/29/2019. (nl)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shaina Vinayek for Health Net Life Insurance. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 8/29/2019. (nl)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 EXHIBITS filed by Health Net Life Insurance, Health Net of Arizona re #6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael W. Lieberman , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3360969,, #5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shaina Vinayek , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3360951,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Lieberman ECF, #2 Exhibit A - Vinayek - Application, #3 Exhibit B - Vinayek - ECF)(Petersen, Scott)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael W. Lieberman , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3360969, filed by Defendants Health Net Life Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Petersen, Scott) Modified on 8/29/2019 to remove Health Net of Arizona as filer (nl).
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shaina Vinayek , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3360951, filed by Defendant Health Net Life Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission) Attorney Scott M. Petersen added to party Health Net Life Insurance(pty:dft), Attorney Scott M. Petersen added to party Health Net of Arizona(pty:dft)(Petersen, Scott) Modified on 8/29/2019 to remove defendant Health Net of Arizona as filer. (nl).
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by E. W., I. W. as to Health Net of Arizona Waiver sent on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (King, Brian)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by E. W., I. W. as to Health Net Life Insurance Waiver sent on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (King, Brian)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Health Net Life Insurance, Health Net of Arizona (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3325231) filed by E. W., I. W.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (King, Brian)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Plaintiffs E. W. and I. W. are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: W. et al v. Health Net Life Insurance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. W.
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nediha Hadzikadunic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I. W.
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nediha Hadzikadunic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Net Life Insurance
Represented By: Michael W. Lieberman
Represented By: Shaina Vinayek
Represented By: Scott M. Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Net of Arizona
Represented By: Shaina Vinayek
Represented By: Michael W. Lieberman
Represented By: Scott M. Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?