Runsted et al v. Clarke and Associates Inc et al
Plaintiff: Clarke and Associates Inc
Petitioner: Susan Kathleen Runsted and Shawn Augustave Runsted
3Rd Party Defendant: Founders Title Company of Davis, Real Estate Education Research Recovery Fund, Cottonwood Title Insurance Agency, Scott Boerstra, Equity Realtors, 4th Street Funding, Jennifer Mosley, Escrow Specialists, Does 1-5, Jeff Norman LLC, DLN DSI Enterprises and Eric V. Lee
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Shawn A. Runsted and Susan K. Runsted
Not Yet Classified: Bankruptcy Clerk's Office
Case Number: 2:2019cv00511
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shawn A. Runsted, Susan K. Runsted COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION, ORDER ON MOTION REQUESTING LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER TO INCLUDE COUNTERCLAIMS AND ADD THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT, AMENDED ANSWER, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, and ORDER APPROVING MOTION TO WITHDRAW REFERENCE OF ADVERSARY PROCDEEDING (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Documents Served)(Finlay, Logan)
September 4, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shawn A. Runsted, Susan K. Runsted re #19 Summons Issued Electronically, #12 Summons Issued Electronically, #15 Summons Issued Electronically, #17 Summons Issued Electronically, #20 Summons Issued Electronically, #10 Summons Issued Electronically, #13 Summons Issued Electronically, #14 Summons Issued Electronically, #11 Summons Issued Electronically, #16 Summons Issued Electronically, #18 Summons Issued Electronically, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summonses Returned)(Finlay, Logan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 20 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to DLN DSI Enterprises. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 19 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Cottonwood Title Insurance Agency. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 18 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to 4th Street Funding. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 17 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Scott Boerstra. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Real Estate Education Research Recovery Fund. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jennifer Mosley. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Jeff Norman LLC. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Founders Title Company of Davis. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Escrow Specialists. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Eric V. Lee. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Equity Realtors. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 File Received from US Bankruptcy Court, District of Utah consisting of Bankruptcy Docket Sheet, Documents 1, 2, 6, 7. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Document 1 - Notice of Removal, #2 Bankruptcy Document 2 - Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Bankruptcy Document 6 - Reply Memorandum Supporting Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim, #4 Bankruptcy Document 7 - Reply memorandum Supporting Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint as to Scott Boerstra) (rks)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting #2 Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference. The automatic reference of this adversarial proceeding to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Utah is withdrawn. The clerk for the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Utah shall transfer the file for this matter forthwith to the clerk for the United States District Court for the District of Utah. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 8/21/2019. (las)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference filed by ThirdParty Defendant Scott Boerstra, Counter Defendant Clarke and Associates Inc, Respondent Clarke and Associates Inc. (Bingham, Darwin)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET TEXT ORDER. Respondent shall file a RESPONSE to #2 MOTION to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference in this court no later than August 19, 2019 at 10:00 AM MDT. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 08/13/19. (dlw)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 Motions No Longer Referred: #4 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply (amn)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply to Scott Boerstra's Reply in Support of Boerstra's Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Shawn Augustave Runsted, Susan Kathleen Runsted, Third Party Plaintiffs Shawn A. Runsted, Susan K. Runsted, Petitioners Shawn Augustave Runsted, Susan Kathleen Runsted, Counter Claimants Shawn A. Runsted, Susan K. Runsted. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed Order)) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Attorney Logan E. Finlay added to party Shawn A. Runsted(pty:3pp)(Finlay, Logan)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 7/23/2019. (las)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference filed by Petitioners Shawn Augustave Runsted and Susan Kathleen Runsted. (tlh)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 CERTIFICATION OF TRANSMISSION OF BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-02070. No filing fee required. filed by Susan Kathleen Runsted, Shawn Augustave Runsted. (Attachments: #1 Application to Withdraw, #2 List of Parties, #3 USBC Docket) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Runsted et al v. Clarke and Associates Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Founders Title Company of Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Real Estate Education Research Recovery Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Cottonwood Title Insurance Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Scott Boerstra
Represented By: Darwin H. Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Equity Realtors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: 4th Street Funding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Jennifer Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Escrow Specialists
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Jeff Norman LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: DLN DSI Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Eric V. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Susan Kathleen Runsted
Represented By: Logan E. Finlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shawn Augustave Runsted
Represented By: Logan E. Finlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Shawn A. Runsted
Represented By: Logan E. Finlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Susan K. Runsted
Represented By: Logan E. Finlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarke and Associates Inc
Represented By: Darwin H. Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Bankruptcy Clerk's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?