Ennis et al v. Alder Protection Holdings et al
Plaintiff: Shadrach Ennis, Nicolaas Vanleeuwen, Shawn Harding and Terrance Jesclard
Defendant: Dane McCartney, Alder Protection Holdings, Adam Christian, Adam Schanz and Kyle DeMordaunt
Case Number: 2:2019cv00512
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Referring Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/13/2020. Motions due by 11/3/2020. Scheduling/Status Conference set for 11/12/2020 at 02:45 PM in Rm 8.100 before Judge Clark Waddoups. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 08/28/2019. (kpf)
August 27, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(McNeill, Shaunda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** RETURN OF SERVICE Unexecuted for Acceptance of Service by Mark H. Richards, General Counsel, served on All named defendants on 7/30/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Shadrach Ennis, Shawn Harding, Terrance Jesclard, Nicolaas Vanleeuwen. (Steward, Matthew)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/29/19. (jmr)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Dane McCartney. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Kyle DeMordaunt. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Adam Christian. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Adam Schanz. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Alder Protection Holdings. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 7/24/2019. (ncw)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Representative Plaintiff's Consent by Terrance Jesclard re #2 Complaint, (Steward, Matthew)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Representative Plaintiff's Consent by Shawn Harding re #2 Complaint, (Steward, Matthew)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Representative Plaintiff's Consent by Shadrach Ennis re #2 Complaint, (Steward, Matthew)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Representative Plaintiff's Consent by Nicolaas Vanleeuwen re #2 Complaint, (Steward, Matthew)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT Collective/Class Action against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3329844) filed by Nicolaas Vanleeuwen, Shadrach Ennis, Terrance Jesclard, Shawn Harding. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Alder Recruitment Brochure, #2 Exhibit B 2018 Sales Statistics, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (Steward, Matthew)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Plaintiffs Shadrach Ennis, Shawn Harding, Terrance Jesclard and Nicolaas Vanleeuwen are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ennis et al v. Alder Protection Holdings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shadrach Ennis
Represented By: Victoria Finlinson
Represented By: Shaunda L. McNeill
Represented By: Matthew A. Steward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolaas Vanleeuwen
Represented By: Victoria Finlinson
Represented By: Shaunda L. McNeill
Represented By: Matthew A. Steward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Harding
Represented By: Victoria Finlinson
Represented By: Shaunda L. McNeill
Represented By: Matthew A. Steward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Jesclard
Represented By: Victoria Finlinson
Represented By: Shaunda L. McNeill
Represented By: Matthew A. Steward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dane McCartney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alder Protection Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Schanz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle DeMordaunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?