Neck Hammock, The v. Chirp et al
Plaintiff: Neck Hammock, The
Defendant: Plexus Yoga, Chirp and Tate Stock
Case Number: 2:2019cv00521
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Referring Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 8/1/2019. (las)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 7/31/2019. (tco)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Report on the Filing of an action mailed to the Register of Copyrights Office. (rks)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office - PATENT. (rks)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office - TRADEMARK. (rks)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3331758) filed by Neck Hammock, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Ted Stewart (Platt, Brian)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Ted Stewart. Plaintiff Neck Hammock, The is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neck Hammock, The v. Chirp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neck Hammock, The
Represented By: Brian N. Platt
Represented By: Brent P. Lorimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plexus Yoga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chirp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?