McCooey v. Progressive Direct Insurance
Plaintiff: Stacy McCooey
Defendant: Progressive Insurance, Progressive Vehicle Service and Progressive Direct Insurance
Case Number: 2:2019cv00526
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Cecilia M Romero
2 Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 9/19/2019. (ncw)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Joyce, Joseph)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 The deadline for submission of Consent/Reassignment forms has now passed. One or more of the parties did not file, therefore the case is no longer eligible for magistrate assignment. Case randomly assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #5 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (nl)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 Progressive Direct Insurance Co.; ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Progressive Direct Insurance.(Joyce, Joseph)
August 8, 2019 NAME CORRECTION of Progressive Insurance. Corrected Name: Progressive Direct Insurance. Refer to document number: #8 Amended Complaint. (nl)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Stacy McCooey. (Jackson, James)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Progressive Insurance, Progressive Vehicle Service. (nl)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 File Received from 3rd District, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket and filings from state court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Return of Summons, #3 Notice of Removal) (nl)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Stacy McCooey, Defendants Progressive Insurance, Progressive Vehicle Service. Form due by 8/13/2019. (nl)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Progressive Direct Insurance Co.; ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Progressive Insurance, Progressive Vehicle Service. Attorney Joseph J. Joyce added to party Progressive Vehicle Service(pty:dft)(Joyce, Joseph)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Stacy McCooey and Defendant Progressive Insurance. (tlh)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 190905219, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3332727) filed by Progressive Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Joyce, Joseph)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Defendants Progressive Insurance and Progressive Vehicle Service are directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCooey v. Progressive Direct Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Insurance
Represented By: Joseph J. Joyce
Represented By: Jeremy G. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Vehicle Service
Represented By: Joseph J. Joyce
Represented By: Jeremy G. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance
Represented By: Joseph J. Joyce
Represented By: Jeremy G. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy McCooey
Represented By: James Robert Jackson
Represented By: Zachary P. Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?