Klein v. Bowers
Plaintiff: R. Wayne Klein
Defendant: Steven Bowers
Case Number: 2:2019cv00530
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1367
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Judge Dale A. Kimball recused. Case reassigned to Judge Ted Stewart for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 9/23/2019. (eat)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 The deadline for submission of Consent/Reassignment forms has now passed. One or more of the parties did not file, therefore the case is no longer eligible for magistrate assignment. Case randomly assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #8 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (nl)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff R. Wayne Klein. (nl)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Steven Bowers, Plaintiff R. Wayne Klein. Form due by 9/3/2019. (nl)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Steven Bowers.(las)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by R. Wayne Klein as to Steven Bowers served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Lehr, Michael)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing of Receiver's Motion to Transfer Related Cases Pursuant to DUCivR 83-2(g) by R. Wayne Klein (Lehr, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 7/30/2019. (nl)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Steven Bowers. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Steven Bowers (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3334131) filed by R. Wayne Klein. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Balls, Jeffery)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff R. Wayne Klein is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klein v. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Wayne Klein
Represented By: Jeffery A. Balls
Represented By: Michael S. Lehr
Represented By: Jonathan O. Hafen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?