Hydraulics International v. Amalga Composites
Plaintiff: Hydraulics International
Defendant: Amalga Composites
Case Number: 2:2019cv00535
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Defendant Amalga Composites, Plaintiff Hydraulics International. (nl)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Amalga Composites. (nl)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Hydraulics International. (nl)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of John DeLuca in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, to Change Venue filed by Defendant Amalga Composites. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Terms and Conditions)(Harden, Angela)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, to Change Venue filed by Defendant Amalga Composites. (Harden, Angela)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Amalga Composites, Plaintiff Hydraulics International. Form due by 9/24/2019. (nl)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Angela B. Harden for Amalga Composites. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 9/5/2019. (las)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Angela B. Harden , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3365005, filed by Defendant Amalga Composites. (Haynie, Laurie)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Laurie A. Haynie on behalf of Amalga Composites (Haynie, Laurie)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hydraulics International as to Amalga Composites served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Parkinson, Kenneth)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 7/30/2019. (nl)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Amalga Composites. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Amalga Composites (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3334442) filed by Hydraulics International. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibits) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Parkinson, Kenneth)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiff Hydraulics International is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hydraulics International v. Amalga Composites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amalga Composites
Represented By: Angela B. Harden
Represented By: Laurie A. Haynie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hydraulics International
Represented By: Peter L. Lattin
Represented By: Kenneth Parkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?