Hyde et al v. Vivint et al
Plaintiff: Jared Hyde and Allison Hyde
Defendant: Vivint, Mansion House and Drew Reilly
Case Number: 2:2019cv00548
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs Allison Hyde, Jared Hyde. (nl)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Allison Hyde, Jared Hyde, Defendants Mansion House, Drew Reilly, Vivint. Form due by 10/1/2019. (nl)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 Vivint, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint filed by Jared Hyde, Alison Hyde, Jared and Alison Hyde as parents and natural guardians of their minor children M.H., Z.H., and E.H. filed by Vivint. Attorney Bryson R. Brown added to party Vivint(pty:dft)(Brown, Bryson)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Mansion House, Drew Reilly. Attorney R. Scott Young added to party Mansion House(pty:dft), Attorney R. Scott Young added to party Drew Reilly(pty:dft)(Young, R.)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 8/2/2019. (nl)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Drew Reilly. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Mansion House. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Vivint. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3338555) filed by Jared Hyde, Allison Hyde. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Pickup, Travis)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Plaintiffs Allison Hyde and Jared Hyde are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyde et al v. Vivint et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivint
Represented By: Bryson R. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mansion House
Represented By: R. Scott Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drew Reilly
Represented By: R. Scott Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Hyde
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Walker
Represented By: Travis R. Pickup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Hyde
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Walker
Represented By: Travis R. Pickup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?