Mandel v. Hafermann et al
Plaintiff: Todd Mandel
Defendant: Holly Hafermann, Elliott Taylor, Paul Rothenberg, Vanessa Ostovich and Rothenberg PC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00563
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Howard C Nielson
Referring Judge: Dustin B Pead
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #11 MOTION to Dismiss, #12 MOTION to Change Venue, #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Responses due by 10/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/25/2019. (nl)
September 25, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #11 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support , #12 MOTION to Change Venue and Memorandum in Support and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Todd Mandel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order granting Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Change Venue) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Deiss, Andrew)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DOCKET TEXT ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate the Court's August 16, 2019, Order to Propose Scheduled is GRANTED #17 . As appropriate, the District Court will address submission of a proposed scheduling order in conjunction with its resolution of Defendants' pending dispositive motions #10 , #11 , #12 .Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 09/13/2019. (amn)
September 12, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Vacate #8 Order to Propose Schedule, filed by Defendants Paul Rothenberg, Rothenberg PC. (Call, Keith)
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 Motions No Longer Referred: #12 Defendants' MOTION to Change Venue will be addressed by the District Court.
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Vanessa Ostovich in Support re #12 MOTION to Change Venue and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Vanessa Ostovich. (Clark, Stephen)
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Elliott Taylor in Support re #12 MOTION to Change Venue and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Elliott Taylor. (Clark, Stephen)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Holly Hafermann in Support re #12 MOTION to Change Venue and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Holly Hafermann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Clark, Stephen)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Change Venue and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Holly Hafermann, Vanessa Ostovich, Elliott Taylor. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Clark, Stephen)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Holly Hafermann, Vanessa Ostovich, Elliott Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Clark, Stephen)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Paul Rothenberg, Rothenberg PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B")(Purcell, Matthew)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of John C. Rooker filed by John C. Rooker on behalf of Holly Hafermann, Vanessa Ostovich, Elliott Taylor (Rooker, John)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/16/2019. (las)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Notice of Removal. Answer deadline updated for Holly Hafermann answer due 8/30/2019; Vanessa Ostovich answer due 8/30/2019; Elliott Taylor answer due 8/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/15/2019. (las)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 File Received from Third District Court - Salt Lake, Salt Lake County consisting of Docket and State Court Documents (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Return of Service, #3 Return of Service, #4 Return of Service, #5 Notice of Appearance, #6 Notice of Appearance, #7 Notice of Appearance, #8 Amended Complaint, #9 Certificate of Service, #10 Substitution of Counsel, #11 Motion, #12 Request to Submit, #13 Notice of Stipulation, #14 Order, #15 Acceptance of Service, #16 Notice of Removal) (las)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time of Deadline for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Defendants Holly Hafermann, Vanessa Ostovich, Elliott Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Manley, Lesley) Modified on 8/15/2019 by correcting motion type (las).
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 8/15/2019. (las)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Holly Hafermann, Vanessa Ostovich, Paul Rothenberg, Rothenberg PC, Elliott Taylor and Plaintiff Todd Mandel. (tlh)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Summit County, case number 180500411, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3345655) filed by Rothenberg PC, Paul Rothenberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Complaint & First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit "B" - All Other Pleadings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (Purcell, Matthew)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr.. Defendants Paul Rothenberg and Rothenberg PC are directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mandel v. Hafermann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Hafermann
Represented By: Lesley A. Manley
Represented By: Stephen C. Clark
Represented By: Brennan J. Curtis
Represented By: John C. Rooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Taylor
Represented By: Lesley A. Manley
Represented By: Stephen C. Clark
Represented By: Brennan J. Curtis
Represented By: John C. Rooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Rothenberg
Represented By: Keith A. Call
Represented By: Matthew B. Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa Ostovich
Represented By: Lesley A. Manley
Represented By: Stephen C. Clark
Represented By: Brennan J. Curtis
Represented By: John C. Rooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rothenberg PC
Represented By: Keith A. Call
Represented By: Matthew B. Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Mandel
Represented By: Andrew G. Deiss
Represented By: Corey Drew Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?