Kim v. Estrada et al
Plaintiff: Youngmee Kim
Defendant: Action Transportation and Oscar Estrada
Case Number: 2:2019cv00569
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 15 RECEIPT: Remand Order was received by 3rd Dist Court, Salt Lake County, on 9/16/19 (alt)
September 4, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per #13 ORDER granting #11 Stipulated Motion to Remand to State Court. Set REMAND and CLOSED flags. (jds)
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL that case has been remanded to 3rd District, Salt Lake County, case number 190903904. (jds)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Stipulated Motion to Remand to State Court. The Court remands this matter to the Utah Third Judicial Court, case number 190903904, Judge Robert Faust. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 9/4/2019. (jds)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #11 Stipulated MOTION to Remand to State Court Third Judicial District Court, State of Utah and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Youngmee Kim. (Bolander, Kevin)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION to Remand to State Court Third Judicial District Court, State of Utah and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Youngmee Kim. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bolander, Kevin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 Redacted MOTION to Remand to State Court Third Judicial District Court, State of Utah and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Youngmee Kim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Service, #3 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Answer, #5 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Bolander, Kevin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Youngmee Kim. (Bolander, Kevin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 State Court MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendant(s) Oscar Estrada and Acton Transportation (originally filed in State Court on 8/13/19) filed by Plaintiff Youngmee Kim (alt)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 File Downloaded from XChangeWEB for 3rd District Court, SL County, consisting of copies of docket sheet and documents filed in state court (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Ntc of Svc on person not named in complaint, #3 State Court Proof of Svc on O. Estrada, #4 State Court Motion for DfltJgm, #5 State Court Ntc of Removal) (alt)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Action Transportation, Oscar Estrada. Attorney Gary R. Guelker added to party Action Transportation(pty:dft)(Guelker, Gary)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Oscar Estrada and Plaintiff Youngmee Kim. (tlh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3348687) filed by Oscar Estrada. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit POS) Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (Guelker, Gary)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Modification of Docket: Error: Counsel did not pay the filing fee or separate the documents correctly. Correction: Counsel has been asked to file the notice of removal again, break the document into separate documents and to pay the filing fee. Answer records deleted re #2 Notice of Removal. (rks)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY ERROR - Disregard NOTICE OF REMOVAL No Filing Fee No Filing Fee filed by Oscar Estrada. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (Guelker, Gary) Modified by adding error text on 8/14/2019 (rks).
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Defendant Oscar Estrada is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kim v. Estrada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Action Transportation
Represented By: Gary R. Guelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar Estrada
Represented By: Gary R. Guelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Youngmee Kim
Represented By: Kevin L. Bolander
Represented By: John R. Tillotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?