Hawkins v. Murray City Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Dallin Hawkins
Defendant: Murray City Police Department and N. Swenson
Not Yet Classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Case Number: 2:2019cv00571
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Referring Judge: Howard C Nielson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Judge Bruce S. Jenkins recused. Case reassigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 8/26/19. (jmr)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to use Preliminary Deposition Transcript as Evidence filed by Plaintiff Dallin Hawkins. (tlh)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Murray City Police Department, N. Swenson (Originally received by the court on 08/14/2019). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Dallin Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope ) Assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins (tlh)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. Collection of Fees Sent: No; denying #2 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 08/22/2019. (tlh)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Dallin Hawkins. (tlh)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: Murray City Police Dearptment and N. Swenson, Detective. filed by Plaintiff Dallin Hawkins. (tlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Service of Process) (tlh).
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 8/14/2019) filed by Plaintiff Dallin Hawkins. (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Murray City Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Prisoner Litigation Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallin Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murray City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?