Core Campus Holdings v. Prospera Growth Fund et al
Plaintiff: Core Campus Holdings
Defendant: Silverado Management and Prospera Growth Fund
Case Number: 2:2019cv00574
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Robert J Shelby
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 After review of the Report of Attorney Planning Meeting #12 , Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Duke, Clinton)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Core Campus Holdings as to Silverado Management served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Duke, Clinton)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Prospera Growth Fund answer due 10/9/2019; Silverado Management answer due 10/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 9/9/2019. (nl)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Core Campus Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duke, Clinton)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Core Campus Holdings as to Prospera Growth Fund served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Duke, Clinton)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 8/16/2019. (las)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Silverado Management. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Prospera Growth Fund. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Tom Monagan and Michael K. Johnson, for Plaintiff Core Campus Holdings. (tlh)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tlh)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3350272) filed by Core Campus Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Duke, Clinton)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff Core Campus Holdings is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Core Campus Holdings v. Prospera Growth Fund et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silverado Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prospera Growth Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Core Campus Holdings
Represented By: Clinton E. Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?