Clark v. American United Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff: Miya Clark
Defendant: American United Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 2:2019cv00580
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Robert J Shelby
Referring Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/2/19. (dla)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 10/1/2019. (mjm)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant American United Federal Credit Union identifying American United Federal Credit Union as Corporate Parent. (Kee, Conrad)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER to #3 Complaint filed by American United Federal Credit Union.(Kee, Conrad)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. Response to the Complaint is now due 9/30/19. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 9/13/2019. No attached document. (chambers)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint filed by Defendant American United Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kee, Conrad)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miya Clark as to American United Federal Credit Union served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Return, #2 Exhibit Summons Issued)(Jackson, Brian)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Christopher Moon on behalf of American United Federal Credit Union (Moon, M.)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Conrad S. Kee on behalf of American United Federal Credit Union (Kee, Conrad)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to American United Federal Credit Union. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against American United Federal Credit Union (Originally received by the court on 08/19/2019). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Miya Clark. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope ) Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (tlh)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 08/20/2019. (tlh)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia Romero for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 08/19/2019) filed by Plaintiff Miya Clark. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. American United Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miya Clark
Represented By: Brian K. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American United Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Conrad S. Kee
Represented By: M. Christopher Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?