Balderas et al v. US Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Alvarez, Juan Balderas and Carola Balderas
Defendant: Bank of America, US Bank National Association, Fay Servicing, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, Countrywide Home Loans Inc., BSI Financial Services and eTitle Insurance Agency
Case Number: 2:2019cv00591
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Referring Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:0191
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendants Fay Servicing, US Bank National Association. (Lancaster, Aaron)
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Address by Rodolfo Alvarez, Carola Balderas, Juan Balderas. (jmr)
October 2, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Plaintiff Rodolfo Alvarez. (jmr)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 Case randomly assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups per docket text order 12 . Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Based upon the procedural posture of this case and the #11 Motion to Dismiss, the undersigned ORDERS that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 09/13/2019. (cvm)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendants Fay Servicing, US Bank National Association. Attorney Aaron D. Lancaster added to party Fay Servicing(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron D. Lancaster added to party US Bank National Association(pty:dft)(Lancaster, Aaron)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Rodolfo Alvarez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nl)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Carola Balderas. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nl)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to eTitle Insurance Agency. (nl)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to BSI Financial Services. (nl)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Fay Servicing. (nl)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Bank of America. (nl)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to Wilmington Savings Fund Society. (nl)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued as to US Bank National Association. (nl)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Change of Address by Rodolfo Alvarez. (nl)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BSI Financial Services, Bank of America, Countrywide Home Loans Inc., Fay Servicing, US Bank National Association, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, eTitle Insurance Agency (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4681087559) (Fee Status: paid) filed by Rodolfo Alvarez, Carola Balderas, Juan Balderas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Deed of Trust, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Assignment of Beneficial Interest of Deed of Trust, #3 Exhibit C-Assignment of Deed of Trust, #4 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (nl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balderas et al v. US Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association
Represented By: Aaron D. Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay Servicing
Represented By: Aaron D. Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSI Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eTitle Insurance Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Balderas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carola Balderas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?