Bourgeois v. Resource Management et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Bourgeois
Defendant: Eric Lagerquist, Horizon Realty Advisors and Resource Management
Case Number: 2:2019cv00595
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Presiding Judge: Bruce S Jenkins
Referring Judge: Cecilia M Romero
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 20 RECEIPT re: Order Remanding Case received by Fourth District Court on 10/3/19. (jmr)
September 30, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL that case has been transferred to Fourth District Court-Provo via Certified Mail Letter and Order Remanding Case sent given case number 190401209. (jmr)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Remand to the Fourth District Court in and forUtah County, State of Utah, Case Number 190401209, before Judge Derek P. Pullan. See Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 9/30/19. (jmr)
September 27, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Remand by Horizon Realty Advisors, Eric Lagerquist, Resource Management re #13 MOTION to Remand to United States District Court of Utah (Winder, Calvin)
September 24, 2019 Filing 16 Case randomly assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins per docket text order 15 . Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero no longer assigned to the case. (nl)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Based upon the procedural posture of this case and the pending #13 Motion for Remand, the undersigned ORDERS that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 09/24/2019. (cvm)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/23/2019. (nl)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to United States District Court of Utah filed by Plaintiff Brenda Bourgeois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McKay, Daniel)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Notice of Removal. Answer deadline updated for Horizon Realty Advisors answer due 9/27/2019; Eric Lagerquist answer due 9/27/2019; Resource Management answer due 9/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 9/13/2019. (nl)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #10 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Notice of Removal,, filed by Defendants Horizon Realty Advisors, Eric Lagerquist, Resource Management. (Winder, Calvin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Notice of Removal,, filed by Defendants Horizon Realty Advisors, Eric Lagerquist, Resource Management. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Exhibit A)(Winder, Calvin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #5 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (nl)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Horizon Realty Advisors, Eric Lagerquist, Resource Management. (nl)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 CLERKS ORDER of Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint re #2 Notice of Removal, signed by Anne W. Morgan, Chief Deputy Clerk, Answer deadline updated for Horizon Realty Advisors answer due 9/13/2019; Eric Lagerquist answer due 9/13/2019; Resource Management answer due 9/13/2019. (nl)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 File Received from 4th District Court -Provo consisting of Docket and filings from state court. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 State Complaint Ex 1-6, #3 State Complaint Ex 7-12, #4 Return of Service E. Lagerquist, #5 Return of Service Resource Management, #6 Return of Service Horizon Realty Advisors, #7 Notice of Filing Removal, #8 Notice of Filing Removal Pt 2, #9 Notice of Filing Removal Pt 3, #10 Notice of Filing Removal Pt 4, #11 Notice of Filing Removal Pt 5, #12 Notice of Filing Removal Pt 6, #13 Notice of Filing Removal Pt 7, #14 Notice of Filing Removal Pt 8, #15 Notice of Filing Removal Pt 9) (nl)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Brenda Bourgeois, Defendants Horizon Realty Advisors, Eric Lagerquist, Resource Management. Form due by 9/10/2019. (tlh)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Brenda Bourgeois and Defendants Horizon Realty Advisors, Eric Lagerquist, Resource Management. (tlh)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to serve a responsive pleading filed by Defendants Horizon Realty Advisors, Eric Lagerquist, Resource Management. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Winder, Calvin)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth District Court Utah County, case number 190401209, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3357126) filed by Resource Management, Horizon Realty Advisors, Eric Lagerquist. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service RMI, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Service HRA, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Service Lagerquist, #5 Exhibit E - Fourth District NOR, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Hagen, Scott)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Defendants Horizon Realty Advisors, Eric Lagerquist and Resource Management are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bourgeois v. Resource Management et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Lagerquist
Represented By: Scott A. Hagen
Represented By: Calvin R. Winder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Realty Advisors
Represented By: Scott A. Hagen
Represented By: Calvin R. Winder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resource Management
Represented By: Scott A. Hagen
Represented By: Calvin R. Winder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Bourgeois
Represented By: Daniel Wayne McKay
Represented By: Elisse Tatiana Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?